EP3486502 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 16-1, HigashiUeno 2-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0015 / JP | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITOH Teppei c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU Juri c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
HIRAKU Kenji c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI Hiromasa c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 05 /
SUGIKI Shouhei c/o HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17827394.2 | 26.06.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017JP23416 | Priority number, date | JP20160140046 | 15.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016140046 | [2019/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018012264 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486502 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3486502 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F15B20/00, E02F9/22, E02F9/24, F15B11/02, F15B11/08 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
F15B19/005 (EP);
F15B20/008 (EP,US);
E02F9/22 (US);
E02F9/2228 (US);
E02F9/2242 (EP);
E02F9/2289 (EP);
E02F9/2292 (EP);
E02F9/2296 (EP);
E02F9/24 (US);
F15B11/02 (US);
F15B11/08 (US);
F15B20/00 (US);
F15B20/004 (US);
E02F3/32 (EP);
F15B2211/20546 (EP);
F15B2211/20561 (EP);
F15B2211/20576 (EP);
F15B2211/255 (EP,US);
F15B2211/2656 (EP);
F15B2211/27 (EP);
F15B2211/30595 (EP);
F15B2211/40507 (EP);
F15B2211/40515 (EP);
F15B2211/4053 (US);
F15B2211/411 (EP);
F15B2211/413 (EP);
F15B2211/41563 (EP);
F15B2211/41572 (EP);
F15B2211/426 (EP);
F15B2211/50536 (EP);
F15B2211/5157 (EP);
F15B2211/526 (EP);
F15B2211/6309 (EP);
F15B2211/665 (EP);
F15B2211/6652 (EP);
F15B2211/6654 (EP);
F15B2211/7053 (EP);
F15B2211/7142 (EP);
F15B2211/857 (EP);
F15B2211/8752 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINEN | [2019/21] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | [2019/21] | French: | ENGIN DE TRAVAUX PUBLICS | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | Translation filed | 15.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 25.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2017 | AL | 12.05.2021 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | ES | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | IT | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | TR | 12.05.2021 | IE | 26.06.2021 | LU | 26.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | FR | 12.07.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | GB | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
TR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GB | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GB | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GB | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GB | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GB | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GB | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 26.06.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 26.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2008291962 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014366519 (SADAMORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [AD]JP2015048899 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2008291962 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-3 * , & DE 102008003462 A *; | [A]JP2009121649 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015048899 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1-3 * , & US 2016/0032565 A1 & EP 3043078 A1 *; | [A]JP2016035321 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3* , & US 2017/0198731 A1 & EP 3176444 A1 * |