EP3486923 - PATTERNED CONDUCTOR, SHEET WITH CONDUCTOR, HEATING PLATE, VEHICLE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF PATTERNED CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/21] | PATTERNED CONDUCTOR, SHEET WITH CONDUCTOR, HEAT-GENERATING PLATE, VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PATTERNED CONDUCTOR | ||
[2021/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUETSUGU, Hirotoshi c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
HIRAKAWA, Manabu c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
GOISHIHARA, Satoshi c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17827679.6 | 12.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017JP25452 | Priority number, date | JP20160137707 | 12.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016137707 | [2019/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018012553 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486923 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3486923 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01B5/14, B60S1/02, C03C27/12, H05B3/20, H05B3/84 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H05B3/84 (EP,US);
B60S1/026 (US);
B60S1/02 (EP,US);
B60S1/586 (US);
H01B5/14 (EP,US);
H05B3/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTURIERTER LEITER, FOLIE MIT LEITER, WÄRMEERZEUGUNGSPLATTE, FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STRUKTURIERTEN LEITERS | [2019/21] | English: | PATTERNED CONDUCTOR, SHEET WITH CONDUCTOR, HEATING PLATE, VEHICLE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF PATTERNED CONDUCTOR | [2021/11] | French: | CONDUCTEUR À MOTIFS, FEUILLE À CONDUCTEUR, PLAQUE DE GÉNÉRATION DE CHALEUR, VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CONDUCTEUR À MOTIFS | [2019/21] |
Former [2019/21] | PATTERNED CONDUCTOR, SHEET WITH CONDUCTOR, HEAT-GENERATING PLATE, VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PATTERNED CONDUCTOR | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2019 | Translation filed | 31.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 29.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2017 | AL | 24.03.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | TR | 24.03.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IE | 12.07.2021 | LU | 12.07.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | HR | 24.03.2021 | |
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 24.03.2021 | |
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 24.03.2021 | |
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | NO | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008149772 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * abstract *; | [A]US2012313880 (GEAGHAN BERNARD O [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP2787101 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0050] , [0059] *; | [XI]WO2016084019 (THERMOCERAMIX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0102] , [0106] - [0107] * [I] 4-11,13-15 | International search | [A]JP2007059892 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & KR 10-2007-0014067 A & CN 1905781 A & TW 200704507 A *; | [X]WO2008149772 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0021], [0056]; examples; fig. 5 & KR 10-2010-0006575 A & TW 200908272 A *; | [X]JP2009138245 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0004], [0016]; examples; fig. 2 & KR 10-2009-0060957 A & CN 101545122 A & TW 200934892 A *; | [A]JP2012156469 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-18 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013105521 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18* , entire text & CN 104039545 A & KR 10-2014-0099531 A & TW 201341174 A & JP 2013-144382 A * |