EP3485470 - SELF-CHECKOUT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itab Shop Products AB P.O. Box 9054 550 09 Jönköping / SE | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENGTSSON, Mikael Fåglabäck 3 568 31 SKILLINGARYD / SE | 02 /
WÄRNBRING, Peter Övre Berghallavägen 4B 564 36 BANKERYD / SE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17828069.9 | 11.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017SE50774 | Priority number, date | SE20160051030 | 11.07.2016 Original published format: SE 1651030 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018013046 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3485470 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, G06Q20/18, A47F9/04, G06F21/31, G06F21/50, G06Q20/20, H04N7/18 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
G06Q20/18 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP);
G06F21/554 (EP);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G07G1/0036 (EP,US);
G07G1/0063 (EP);
G07G3/003 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | SELBSTBEDIENUNGSKASSENSYSTEM | [2019/21] | English: | SELF-CHECKOUT SYSTEM | [2019/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAISSE LIBRE-SERVICE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 26.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2022 | 25.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/18] | 30.12.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP23154153.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7076441 (HIND JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 5, lines 11-20 *; | [I]US2007294207 (BROWN LISA MARIE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0014] , [0015] , [0026] - [0051] *; | [A]US2008249837 (ANGELL ROBERT LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0103] *; | [A]US2011320322 (ROSLAK THOMAS K [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US2015039458 (REID GREGORIO [PA]) [A] 1-14* abstract * | International search | [A]US5992570 (WALTER JOANNE S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; figure 1; claim 6 *; | [A]EP1717772 (RETAIL RESPONSE SWEDEN AB [SE]) [A] 1-15* ; abstract; figure 1; claim 14 *; | [X]JP2009009231 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: WPI database; Original document: abstract; paragraphs [0009]-[0011], [0014], [0018]-[0019], [0021 ]-[0039], [0045]-[0046], [0103], [0108]-[0114]; figures 1-2,4,9 *; | [A]JP2012243082 (TERAOKA SEIKO KK) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: WPI database; Original document: abstract; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014128624 (XHOCKWARE S A [PT]) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract * |