EP3485044 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO FACILITATE GENETIC RESEARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacific Northwest Diabetes Research Institute 720 Broadway Seattle, Washington 98122 / US | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDLEY, Aimee M. 720 Broadway Seattle Washington 98122 / US | 02 /
CROMIE, Gareth 720 Broadway Seattle Washington 98122 / US | 03 /
SIRR, Amy 720 Broadway Seattle Washington 98122 / US | 04 /
SAKHANENKO, Nikita 720 Broadway Seattle Washington 98122 / US | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Hobson, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Hobson, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17828589.6 | 14.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017US42265 | Priority number, date | US201662362708P | 15.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662362708 P | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018014002 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3485044 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6869, C12Q1/6806, G16B20/00, G16B20/40 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
G01N1/30 (US);
G01N15/14 (US);
G01N15/1434 (US);
G16B20/00 (EP);
G16B20/40 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (US);
G01N2001/302 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2537/165 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/21] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/81, C12Q1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER GENETISCHEN FORSCHUNG | [2019/21] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO FACILITATE GENETIC RESEARCH | [2019/21] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À FACILITER LA RECHERCHE GÉNÉTIQUE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 01.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014059370 (INST SYSTEMS BIOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * para. 6, 7, 24, 25, 31; fig. 1 *; | [Y] - Attfield Paul V. and Bell Philip J.L., "Genetics and classical genetic manipulations of industrial yeasts", Attfield Paul V. and Bell Philip J.L., J H De Winde ET AL, Functional Genetics of Industrial Yeasts, Springer, (20030101), pages 17 - 55, ISBN 978-3-540-37003-1, XP009517679 [Y] 1-15 * fig. 2; para. bridging p. 32-33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007%2F3-540-37003-X_2 | [AD] - NIKITA A. SAKHANENKO ET AL, "Biological Data Analysis as an Information Theory Problem: Multivariable Dependence Measures and the Shadows Algorithm", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY., US, (20151101), vol. 22, no. 11, doi:10.1089/cmb.2015.0051, ISSN 1066-5277, pages 1005 - 1024, XP055455517 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/cmb.2015.0051 | [A] - GARETH A. CROMIE ET AL, "Genomic Sequence Diversity and Population Structure of Saccharomyces cerevisiae Assessed by RAD-seq", G3, GENES|GENOMES|GENETICS, (20131011), vol. 3, no. 12, doi:10.1534/g3.113.007492, pages 2163 - 2171, XP055652400 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/g3.113.007492 | [A] - DAVID J. GALAS ET AL, "Describing the Complexity of Systems: Multivariable "Set Complexity" and the Information Basis of Systems Biology", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY., US, (20140201), vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1089/cmb.2013.0039, ISSN 1066-5277, pages 118 - 140, XP055652403 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/cmb.2013.0039 | [A] - PAUL M. MAGWENE ET AL, "The Statistics of Bulk Segregant Analysis Using Next Generation Sequencing", PLOS COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY, (20111103), vol. 7, no. 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pcbi.1002255, page e1002255, XP055652407 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pcbi.1002255 | International search | [Y]US2012164677 (FLEMING JAMES E [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * Abstract; para [0042]; para [0091] *; | [Y]WO2014059370 (INST SYSTEMS BIOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * Abstract; para [0006-0007]; para [0013]; para [0017]; para [0021]; para [0024-0026]; para [0042-0043]; para [0051] *; | [Y] - SAKHANENKO et al., "Biological Data Analysis as an Information Theory Problem: Multivariable Dependence Measures and the Shadows Algorithm", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY, (20150000), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1005 - 1024, XP055455517 [Y] 16, 18-19 - * . p1006, last para; p1007, para 4; p1009, para 4, 6; p1019, para 2; Supplementary Material, p1, para 1, Supplementary Material, p1019, para 2, Supplemental Figs. S3-S5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/cmb.2015.0051 | [Y] - IGNAC et al., "Discovering Pair-Wise Genetic Interactions: An Information Theory-Based Approach", PLoS ONE, (20140326), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 1 - 14, XP055455524 [Y] 17 * , pg 1 col 1 para 1, pg 3, col 2 para 3, pg 9 col 2 para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0092310 | [A] - Anonymous, "BD LSRFortessa X-20 Cell Analyzer", (20171030), pages 1 - 2, bdbiosciences, URL: https://www.bdbiosciences.com/documents/lsr_fortessax20_filter_guide.pdf, XP055592347 [A] 7 * whole doc. * |