EP3551221 - NOVEL T CELL RECEPTORS AND IMMUNE THERAPY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTEN, Leonie Weißdornweg 14 App. 161 72076 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
BUNK, Sebastian Gertrud-Baeumer-Str. 19/1 72074 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
MAURER, Dominik Fleinerweg 7 72116 Moessingen / DE | 04 /
WAGNER, Claudia Nürtinger Strasse 32 72074 Tübingen / DE | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17829609.1 | 07.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017EP81800 | Priority number, date | DE201610123847 | 08.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016123847 | US201662431588P | 08.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662431588 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018104438 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3551221 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551221 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/725, C07K14/47 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/1774 (KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464486 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464488 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/70514 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/574 (KR);
A61K2039/572 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
G01N2333/705 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | 18.06.2019 | ME | 18.06.2019 | Validation states | MA | 18.06.2019 | MD | 18.06.2019 | TN | 18.06.2019 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE T-ZELL-REZEPTOREN UND IMMUNTHERAPIE MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/42] | English: | NOVEL T CELL RECEPTORS AND IMMUNE THERAPY USING THE SAME | [2019/42] | French: | NOUVEAUX RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T ET IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE LES UTILISANT | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 18.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2020/16] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21207265.6 / EP4032544 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | [2022/39] |
Former [2022/33] | SM | 10.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014118236 (MAX DELBRÜCK CT FÜR MOLEDULARE MEDIZIN MDC BERLIN BUCH [DE]); | [A]US2015337369 (DAVIS MARK M [US], et al); | [AP]CN106749620 (GUANGZHOU XIANGXUE PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [AP]WO2017158103 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]); | Examination | WO2013039889 | WO2017216324 | WO2018170338 | WO2019067242 | by applicant | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5714352 | US2002197266 |