|
19.06.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.03.2023 |
Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2023 |
Letter relating to the revocation of the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.08.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.03.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.03.2018 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.01.2018 |
Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.01.2018 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
8 |