30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
20.06.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
14.07.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
12.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
03.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.04.2022 |
First examination report |
|
01.04.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
06.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
08.11.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.11.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
21.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|