Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11313032 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2022 | B2 | US2019338409 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017DE101041 | 04.12.2017 | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102458216B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B1 | KR20190112728 | 07.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017DE101041 | 04.12.2017 | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7003130B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2022 | B2 | JP2020506818 | 05.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017DE101041 | 04.12.2017 | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110234787 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017DE101041 | 04.12.2017 | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3577252 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2023 | B1 | EP3577252 | 11.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017DE101041 | 04.12.2017 | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018141317 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017102059 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017102059 | 02.02.2017 |