EP3487822 - GLASSES, CEMENTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Towler, Mark Robert 11992 Village Circle Rolla, MO 65401 / US | For all designated states Alhalawani, Adel Moh'd Fawzi A.R. 1916 Jasper St Terre Haute, IN 47803 / US | [2024/04] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Towler, Mark Robert 360 Bloor Street East 1102 Toronto, Ontario M4W 3M3 / CA | ||
For all designated states Alhalawani, Adel Moh'd Fawzi A.R. 18 Yonge St. Suite 2707 Toronto, Ontario M5E 1Z8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | Di Giovine, Paolo, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2019/22] | Papa, Elisabetta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 17830143.8 | 14.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017CA50854 | Priority number, date | US201662364479P | 20.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662364479 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018014120 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487822 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3487822 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/097, A61K6/00, A61L24/12, C03C3/062 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
C03C3/062 (EP,US);
A61K6/864 (EP,US);
A61K6/889 (EP,US);
A61L24/12 (EP,US);
C03C3/078 (US);
C03C3/097 (US);
C03C4/0007 (EP);
C03C4/0021 (EP,US);
C04B28/28 (EP);
A61L2430/02 (US);
C03C2204/00 (US);
C03C2205/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C04B28/28, C04B14/22, C04B40/065 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/22] | C03C3/097, A61K6/083, A61L24/12, C03C3/062 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLÄSER, ZEMENTE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/22] | English: | GLASSES, CEMENTS AND USES THEREOF | [2019/22] | French: | VERRES, CIMENTS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 08.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY] - ALHALAWANI ADEL M F ET AL, "The effect of ZnO<->Ta2O5substitution on the structural and thermal properties of SiO2-ZnO-SrO-CaO-P2O5glasses", MATERIALS CHARACTERIZATION, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20160308), vol. 114, doi:10.1016/J.MATCHAR.2016.03.004, ISSN 1044-5803, pages 218 - 224, XP029475089 [I] 1,2,5 * Abstract; paragraphs [0001] , [0002]; table 1 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 6-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchar.2016.03.004 | [YA] - ADEL ALHALAWANI ET AL, "A Novel Glass Polyalkenoate Cement for Fixation and Stabilisation of the Ribcage, Post Sternotomy Surgery: An ex-Vivo Study", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL BIOMATERIALS, (20131121), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.3390/jfb4040329, pages 329 - 357, XP055453674 [Y] 6-15 * abstract; paragraphs [0001] , [03.1] , [03.3] , [0005]; table 2 * [A] 1-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jfb4040329 | [YA] - ALHALAWANI ADEL M ET AL, "A glass polyalkenoate cement carrier for bone morphogenetic proteins", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, UNITED STATES, vol. 26, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S10856-015-5494-3, ISSN 0957-4530, (20150314), pages 1 - 9, (20150314), XP035468754 [Y] 6-12,15 * abstract; paragraphs [0001] , [02.1] , [02.2] * [A] 1-5,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10856-015-5494-3 | International search | [X]US2011123832 (MATSUMOTO NAOMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 and 8 * Paragraphs 0056-0061, 0064, 0067, 0073, 0075, 0083, and 0086 *; | [XY] - ALHALAWANI et al., "The effect of ZnO ? Ta2O5 substitution on the structure and thermal properties of SiO2-ZnO-SrO-CaO-P2O5 glasses", Material Characterization, (20160300), vol. 114, pages 218 - 224, XP029475089 [X] 1-3, & 7-10 * Whole document, in particular, table 1, example Tal * [Y] 1-3, 7-10, & 14-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchar.2016.03.004 | [Y] - BOYD et al., "The role of Sr2+ on the structure and reactivity of SrO-CaO-ZnO-SiO2 ionomer glasses", Journal of Materials Science : Materials in medicine, (20080000), vol. 19, pages 953 - 957, XP019575514 [Y] 14-23, & 31-39 * Whole document * | [Y] - ALHALAWANI et al., "A glass polyalkenoate cement carrier for bone morphogenetic proteins", Journal of Materials Science : Materials in Medicine, (20150000), vol. 26, page 151, XP035468754 [Y] 14-24, & 31-39 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10856-015-5494-3 | [Y] - WREN et al., "Gallium containing glass polyalkenoate anti-cancerous bone cements: glass characterization and physical properties", Journal of Materials Science : Materials in Medicine, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 1823 - 1833, XP035087822 [Y] 14-18, 20-24, & 31-39 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10856-012-4624-4 | [Y] - ALHALAWANI et al., "A Novel Glass Polyalkenoate Cement for Fixation and Stabilisation of the Ribcage, Post Sternotomy Surgery: An ex-Vivo Study", Journal of Functional Biomaterials, (20130000), vol. 4, pages 329 - 357, XP055453674 [Y] 23-30 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jfb4040329 | [PX] - ALHALAWANI et al., "A novel tantalum-containing bioglass. Part I. Structure and solubility", Materials Science and Engineering C, (20161118), vol. 72, pages 202 - 211, XP029863379 [PX] 1-39 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msec.2016.11.066 | [PX] - ALHALAWANI et al., "A novel tantalum-containing bioglass. Part II. Development of a bioadhesive for sternal fixation and repair", Materials Science and Engineering C, vol. 71, (20170000), pages 401 - 411, (20161018), XP029848931 [PX] 1-39 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msec.2016.10.024 | [A] - ALHALAWANI et al., "The role of poly(arylic acid) in conventional glass polyalkenoate cements", Polym Eng, (20160000), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 221 - 237, XP055453678 [A] 14-39 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/polyeng-2015-0079 |