|
29.05.2024 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2020 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
58 |