EP3489235 - TRICYCLIC COMPOUND AS CRTH2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chia Tai Tianqing Pharmaceutical Group Co., Ltd. No. 369 Yuzhou South Road Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222062 / CN | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Chia Tai Tianqing Pharmaceutical Group Co., Ltd. No. 369 Yuzhou South Road Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222062 / CN | ||
For all designated states Medshine Discovery Inc. Room 218, No.9 Gaoxin Road Gaoxin Development District Nanjing, Jiangsu 310032 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Bin 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 02 /
YAO, Yuanshan 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Yuan 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 04 /
LI, Ao 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 05 /
XU, Ran 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 06 /
HUANG, Zhensheng 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 07 /
TIAN, Dongdong 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 08 /
LI, Hongwei 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 09 /
YANG, Chengshuai 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 10 /
LI, Jian 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 11 /
CHEN, Shuhui 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Thurston, Joanna Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17830501.7 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017CN93850 | Priority number, date | CN201610581810 | 21.07.2016 Original published format: CN201610581810 | [2019/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018014867 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489235 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/4985, A61K31/437, A61K31/4709, A61K31/444, A61P37/08 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61K31/4985 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/4985, A61K31/437, A61K31/4709, A61K31/444, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG ALS CRTH2-INHIBITOR | [2019/22] | English: | TRICYCLIC COMPOUND AS CRTH2 INHIBITOR | [2019/22] | French: | COMPOSÉ TRICYCLIQUE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEUR DE CRTH2 | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2019 | Translation filed | 18.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 01.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO02094830 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * , description, page 2, line 4 to page 5, line 15 and page 16, lines 10-15, and embodiments 1 and 2, and claims 25-26, 32 and 33 *; | [X]WO2006026273 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15* , description, page 3, line 22 to page 4, line 2 and page 4, tables *; | [X]WO2006052798 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * , description, page 2, lines 25-37 and page 3, tables *; | [X]CN101189011 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * , description, page 4, paragraphs 3-5 *; | [X] - BEALTLIEU, C. et al., "Identification of Prostaglandin D2 Receptor Antagonists Based on a Tetrahydropyridoindole Scaffold", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20080310), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.03.015, pages 2696 - 2700, XP022606374 [X] 1-15 * and page 2698, table 2, and abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.03.015 | by applicant | WO2005044260 | WO2005123731 | - BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 |