EP3489225 - VORTIOXETINE ANALOGUE AND USE AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Nhwaluokang Pharmaceutical Research and Development Co., Ltd. 1 Yunhe Road High-tech Industrial Development Zone Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221000 / CN | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qingeng 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Tao 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | 03 /
LIAO, Jian 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | 04 /
XU, Xiangqing 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | 05 /
REN, Liang 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/22] | 01 /
WANG, Tao 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | ||
02 /
LIAO, Jian 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | |||
03 /
XU, Xiangqing 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | |||
04 /
REN, Liang 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Qingeng 6th Floor Innovation Productivity Promotion Center Xiyong Avenue Shapingba District Chongqing 401332 / CN | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17830514.0 | 24.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017CN94037 | Priority number, date | CN201610584432 | 22.07.2016 Original published format: CN201610584432 | [2019/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018014880 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489225 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/096, C07D295/205, C07D295/185, C07D295/192, C07C321/26, C07C319/02, A61K31/495, A61P25/24 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/495 (EA,KR);
A61P25/24 (EA,KR,US);
C07C319/02 (EP,EA,US);
C07C321/26 (EA,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,EA,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C319/02, C07C321/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | VORTIOXETINANALOGON UND VERWENDUNG DAVON UND HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/22] | English: | VORTIOXETINE ANALOGUE AND USE AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [2019/22] | French: | ANALOGUE DE VORTIOXÉTINE, SON UTILISATION ET SA PRÉPARATION | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2019 | Translation filed | 06.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 02.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]GB281290 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [X] 9 * , description, embodiment 1, step b, description, embodiment 1, step b * [Y] 10; | [XY]WO9316067 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [X] 9 * , description, page 20, description, page 20 * [Y] 10; | [XY]CN1561336 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK]) [X] 1-5 * , claim 1 and 11-13, and description, pages 8-13, claim 1 and 11-13, and description, pages 8-13 * [Y] 6-8; | [XY]CN101709045 (UNIV ZHEJIANG) [X] 9 * , description, embodiment 13, description, embodiment 13 * [Y] 10; | [Y]WO2015107057 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS [SI]) [Y] 6-8 * , abstract, and claim 1, and description, pages 7-8 *; | [XY] - CAS, (20151204), Database accession no. 75.2659, URL: STN [X] 9 [Y] 10 | [Y] - BANDGAR, B.P. et al., "Rapid Synthesis of Thiophenols Under Mild and Non-Aqueous Conditions", SULFUR LETTERS, (20001231), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 123 - 126, XP009514644 [Y] 10 |