EP3488788 - ULTRASONIC OBSERVATION DEVICE, OPERATION METHOD OF ULTRASONIC OBSERVATION DEVICE, AND OPERATION PROGRAM OF ULTRASONIC OBSERVATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAKE, Tatsuya c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17830857.3 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017JP24798 | Priority number, date | JP20160141618 | 19.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016141618 | [2019/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018016337 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488788 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/14, A61B8/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/14 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP);
A61B8/469 (EP);
A61B8/485 (EP,US);
A61B8/5207 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (EP,US);
A61B1/273 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLBEOBACHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DER ULTRASCHALLBEOBACHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSPROGRAMM DER ULTRASCHALLBEOBACHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/22] | English: | ULTRASONIC OBSERVATION DEVICE, OPERATION METHOD OF ULTRASONIC OBSERVATION DEVICE, AND OPERATION PROGRAM OF ULTRASONIC OBSERVATION DEVICE | [2019/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBSERVATION ÉCHOGRAPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF D'OBSERVATION ÉCHOGRAPHIQUE, ET PROGRAMME DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'OBSERVATION ÉCHOGRAPHIQUE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2019 | Translation filed | 15.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 06.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007112267 (MATSUMURA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0044] - [0065] - [0078]; figures 1,3-5,7,8 * [I] 9; | [X]US2011040185 (MATSUMURA TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1,13 * figures 1,5 *; | [XAI]US2015148676 (CHOI KI-WAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-13 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0073] - [0085] - [0089] - [0095] - [0100] - [0116] - [0131] , [0135] - [0137] - [0141] - [0148]; figures 1-23; claims 1-27 * * paragraphs [0153] - [0161] - [0169] - [0175] - [0184] * [A] 7 [I] 4,5; | [A]US2015279025 (WAKI KOJI [JP]) [A] 2,7 * paragraph [0068]; figures 2-7 *; | [X] - MATSUMURA T ET AL, "Diagnostic results for breast disease by real-time elasticity imaging system", 2004 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM : 23 - 27 AUGUST 2004, PALAIS DES CONGRÈS, MONTRÉAL, CANADA, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20040823), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2004.1418083, ISBN 978-0-7803-8412-5, pages 1484 - 1487, XP010784243 [X] 1-3,7,13 * page 1484, column right, paragraph 3 - page 1486, column left, paragraph 2; figures 1,4,5,6; table 1 * * page 1487, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2004.1418083 | [A] - KONIG K ET AL, "INITIAL EXPERIENCES WITH REAL-TIME ELASTOGRAPHY GUIDED BIOPSIES OF THE PROSTATE", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 174, no. 1, ISSN 0022-5347, (20050701), pages 115 - 117, (20050701), XP027855761 [A] 2,7 * page 116, column left, paragraph 3 * | International search | [A]WO2009131027 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* , entire text; all drawings & EP 2272435 A1 *; | [A]JP2011092224 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & KR 10-2011-0046328 A *; | [A]JP2012061317 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |