EP3489553 - VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE AND VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIHIRO, Yoshimasa c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1 Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
OOTA, Yusuke c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1 Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 03 /
OHSHIO, Shintaro c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17830910.0 | 11.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017JP25304 | Priority number, date | JP20160141577 | 19.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016141577 | [2019/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018016391 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489553 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489553 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, B60W10/02, B60W10/107, F02D29/00, F02D29/02, F16H59/44, F16H59/70, F16H61/662, F16H63/46, F16H63/50, B60W10/06, B60W10/101, B60W30/18 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B60W30/18072 (EP,US);
F16H61/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W10/107 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/101 (EP,US);
B60W30/18054 (KR);
B60W30/181 (KR);
B60W40/105 (KR);
F02D29/00 (EP,US);
F02D29/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16H59/44 (EP,KR,US);
F16H59/70 (EP,KR,US);
F16H61/662 (EP,KR,US);
F16H63/46 (EP,KR,US);
F16H63/50 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2030/1809 (KR,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2510/1005 (US);
B60W2520/10 (KR,US);
B60W2530/13 (KR);
B60W2710/021 (US);
B60W2710/0644 (US);
B60W2710/1005 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/72 (US);
F16H2037/026 (US);
F16H37/022 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | F16H61/02, B60W10/02, B60W10/107, F02D29/00, F02D29/02, F16H59/44, F16H59/70, F16H61/662, F16H63/46, F16H63/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/22] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE AND VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD | [2019/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2019 | Translation filed | 21.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 13.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2017 | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 11.07.2017 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013159896 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2014231889 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015068857 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015092518 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH09112672 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 5 * , paragraph [0005]; fig. 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013190653 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , & US 2015/0166064 A1 & EP 2865913 A1 & KR 2015-0010982 A & CN 104471269 A *; | [Y]JP2014231889 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 4, 5 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0027]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2015094377 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1, 6 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0066]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2016/0272208 A1 paragraphs [0009] to [0079]; fig. 1 to 4 & WO 2015/068857 A1 & CN 105705392 A * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]JP2015117738 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 2-5 * , paragraphs [0027] to [0030]; fig. 2 & US 2017/0028990 A1 paragraphs [0037] to [0040]; fig. 2 & WO 2015/092518 A1 & CN 105829182 A *; | [A]JP2016020126 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6* , & US 2016/0009292 A1 & DE 102015109605 A1 & CN 105270395 A * |