EP3489970 - INSULATED WIRE, COIL, AND ELECTRIC OR ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/22] | INSULATED ELECTRIC WIRE, COIL, AND ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC INSTRUMENT | ||
[2023/29] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essex Furukawa Magnet Wire Japan Co., Ltd. 16-8, Uchikanda 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
For all designated states Furukawa Magnet Wire Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Hideo c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
TOMOMATSU, Isao c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
OYA, Makoto c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
MUTO, Daisuke c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2019/22] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17831014.0 | 18.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017JP25993 | Priority number, date | JP20160141817 | 19.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016141817 | [2019/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018016498 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489970 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489970 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/02, H01F5/06, H01F41/12, H01B13/14, H01B3/30, H01B3/44 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H01B3/301 (EP,KR,US);
H01B7/0208 (KR);
H01B7/0216 (US);
H01B13/141 (EP,US);
H01B13/148 (EP);
H01B3/305 (EP,US);
H01B3/306 (EP,KR,US);
H01B3/427 (KR);
H01B3/441 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | H01B7/02, H01F5/06, H01F41/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERTER STROMDRAHT, SPULE UND ELEKTRISCHE ODER ELEKTRONISCHE GERÄTE | [2023/29] | English: | INSULATED WIRE, COIL, AND ELECTRIC OR ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT | [2023/29] | French: | CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE ISOLÉ, BOBINE ET ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE OU ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/29] |
Former [2019/22] | ISOLIERTER STROMDRAHT, SPULE UND ELEKTRISCHES/ELEKTRONISCHES INSTRUMENT | ||
Former [2019/22] | INSULATED ELECTRIC WIRE, COIL, AND ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC INSTRUMENT | ||
Former [2019/22] | CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE ISOLÉ, BOBINE, ET INSTRUMENT ÉLECTRIQUE/ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | Translation filed | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 26.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010203231 (KUSAKA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0128] *; | [X]US2014216340 (KUSAKA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0127] *; | [X]WO2015186730 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * WPI abstract *; | [XP]US2017084361 (OYA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [XP] 1-6 * paragraph [0129] ** paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0169]; examples 1-4; table 1 * | International search | [A]WO2015105095 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* , & US 2016/0322126 A1 & EP 3093855 A1 & KR 10-2016-0106638 A & CN 105900185 A & TW 201539490 A *; | [A]WO2016103804 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , & JP 2016-126867 A * |