EP3489561 - PLASTIC VALVE CAPABLE OF PREVENTING DISTORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Sang Seon (Musil E-Pyunhan Sesang APT., Musil-dong) 204-503, 89, Mandae-ro Wonju-si Gangwon-do 26386 / KR | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17831298.9 | 17.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017KR07663 | Priority number, date | KR20160092122 | 20.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160092122 | KR20160092159 | 20.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160092159 | KR20160092178 | 20.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160092178 | [2019/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018016825 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489561 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/024, F16L23/00, F16L55/00, B29C45/14, F16L41/02, F16L23/032, F16K27/00, F16L9/12, B29L31/00, F16L47/14, F16L57/00 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
F16K27/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29C45/14 (EP,CN,US);
B29C45/14467 (CN,US);
F16L23/003 (EP,CN);
F16L23/032 (EP,CN,US);
F16L41/021 (EP,CN,US);
F16L47/14 (EP,CN,US);
F16L57/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2101/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | F16L23/024, F16L23/00, F16L55/00, B29C45/14, F16L41/02, F16L23/032, F16K27/00, F16L9/12, B29L31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFVENTIL ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON VERZERRUNGEN | [2019/22] | English: | PLASTIC VALVE CAPABLE OF PREVENTING DISTORTION | [2019/22] | French: | VALVE EN PLASTIQUE POUVANT EMPÊCHER UNE DISTORSION | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2018 | Translation filed | 22.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 24.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/31] | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/31] | Divisional application(s) | EP22159781.8 / EP4027045 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3082022 (MOORE JAMES A) [Y] 8,9* figures 5,7 *; | [Y]US4676268 (SANO NICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * the whole document *; | [XY]CN201326860Y (HUACHUANG TIANYUAN IND DEV CO [CN]) [X] 8,9 * abstract * [Y] 8,9 | International search | [Y]JPH0634083 (NIHON VALQUA KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,5-7,9-11,17 * See paragraphs [0008]-[0016] and figures 1-5. *; | [X]KR20100094048 (SAM JUNG DCP CO LTD [KR]) [X] 21-28 * See paragraphs [0013], [0022]-[0033] and figures 2-4. *; | [A]KR100996950B (GOLEE CO., LTD.) [A] 1-28* See abstract; paragraphs [0008]-[0015]; and figures 1-4. *; | [XY]KR20120119653 (PEM KOREA CO LTD [KR]) [X] 12-16,18-20 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0032] and figures 1-2. * [Y] 17; | [XYA]KR101324938B (SINEP & C CO LTD [KR]) [X] 8 * See paragraphs [0014], [0020], [0037]-[0042] and figure la-4b. * [Y] 1, 5-7,9-11 [A] 2-4, 12-28 |