29.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.12.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2023 |
First examination report |
|
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
29.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
18.09.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
14.02.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
14.02.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
20.09.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
20.09.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
30.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
19.04.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
02.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
22.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|