EP3487438 - DENTAL LASER SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biolase, Inc. 4 Cromwell Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCAN, Matt 68 Via Sonrisa San Clemente California 92673 / US | 02 /
BOUTOUSSOV, Dmitri 32811 Sail Way Dana Point California 92629 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | WBH Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Müllerstraße 40 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Wachenhausen & Kollegen Patentanwälte GbR Schellingstrasse 29 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17831864.8 | 20.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017US43053 | Priority number, date | US201662364782P | 20.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662364782 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018017822 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487438 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B50/13, A61B18/20, A61B50/10, A61B50/18, A61C1/00, A61G15/16 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A61C1/0046 (EP,US);
A61B50/13 (EP);
A61G15/16 (EP);
A61N5/0601 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
A61B18/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | A61C1/00, A61C19/06, A61C19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | DENTALLASERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2019/22] | English: | DENTAL LASER SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/22] | French: | SYSTÈME LASER DENTAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 12.05.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004262867 (ARCETA RADMOND VINCENT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * figure 9A * * figure 9B * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]US2014147802 (NALDONI MORENO [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] *; | [Y]US2013307237 (CHEN YAW-LIN [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2014113243 (BOUTOUSSOV DMITRI [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * | International search | [Y]US2004262867 (ARCETA RADMOND VINCENT [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0078]; claims 1-10; figures 1, 6A-11. *; | [Y]US2014147802 (NALDONI MORENO [IT]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0017]; claims 1-10; figure 1. *; | [Y]CN203898622U (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN) [Y] 18, 20 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0036]; claim 1; figures 1-3. *; | [A]US4572594 (SCHWARTZ C BRUCE [US]) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US7213822 (WEBSTER JOHN H [CA]) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2001035702 (MURPHY BRIAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. * |