EP3560001 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBION, Bertrand 100 avenue du Granier 38530 Poncharra / FR | 02 /
GASSE, Adrien 16 avenue du Grand Champ 38180 Seyssins / FR | 03 /
VOLPERT, Marion 4 bis chemin du petit bois 38360 Sassanage / FR | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17832085.9 | 18.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017FR53637 | Priority number, date | FR20160063191 | 22.12.2016 Original published format: FR 1663191 | [2019/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018115670 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560001 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/38, H01L33/40, H01L33/14 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
H01L33/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/08 (US);
H01L33/14 (EP,KR);
H01L33/24 (KR,US);
H01L33/40 (EP,KR);
H01L2933/0016 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/44] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE | [2019/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 25.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03077387 (QUINTESSENCE PHOTONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,12,13 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 9 * * figures 3,5,6 * [I] 7,9-11; | [X]US2012032182 (SILLS SCOTT E [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0023] , [0034] * * figure 5 *; | [X]CN105742450 (UNIV NANCHANG, et al) [X] 1,12 * figures 6,7,9 *; | [XI]US2012049756 (SCHUBERT MARTIN F [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * * figures 1A,1B,3A-D * [I] 7,9-11; | [XI]US2008246047 (HSU CHIH PENG [TW], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,12 * paragraph [0007] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 7,9-11; | [X]US2003062821 (WEGLEITER WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2002159492 (YAMAMURA SHIN ICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,12,14 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * figure 2 * [I] 9-11 | by applicant | FR3012676 |