EP3542069 - COMPRESSOR, TURBOCHARGER AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/39] | COMPRESSOR, EXHAUST GAS TURBOCHARGER AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | ||
[2023/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERTI, Peter Am Gänsegrund 3 38553 Wasbüttel / DE | 02 /
KAMMEYER, Jasper Aegidiendamm 9 30169 Hannover / DE | 03 /
BARTOLOME, Javier Blücherstrasse 3a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
WERNER, Ronny Seebergblick 23 01612 Glaubitz / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17832472.9 | 01.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017EP77970 | Priority number, date | DE201610222585 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: DE102016222585 | DE201710209598 | 07.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017209598 | [2019/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018091269 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3542069 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3542069 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/46, F04D27/02, F04D29/42, F02B37/22, F02M26/09, F02M26/10, F02M26/17, F02M26/19, F02M26/21, F02M26/50 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
F04D27/0253 (EP);
F02B37/225 (EP);
F02C6/12 (EP);
F02M26/09 (EP);
F02M26/10 (EP);
F02M26/17 (EP);
F02M26/19 (EP);
F02M26/21 (EP);
F02M26/50 (EP);
F04D29/4213 (EP);
F04D29/464 (EP);
F05D2220/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | F04D29/46, F04D27/02, F04D29/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | VERDICHTER, ABGASTURBOLADER UND BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2019/39] | English: | COMPRESSOR, TURBOCHARGER AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2023/02] | French: | COMPRESSEUR, TURBOCOMPRESSEUR ET MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2023/02] |
Former [2019/39] | COMPRESSOR, EXHAUST GAS TURBOCHARGER AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | ||
Former [2019/39] | COMPRESSEUR, TURBOCOMPRESSEUR À GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 17.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004003209 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US7350356 (SUMSER SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 27 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE102006053710 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6-17 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP1947299 (JEGEL FRANZ PETER ING [AT]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] ** figures 1, 2, 5, 6 *; | [A]DE102012013595 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [ID]WO2015091268 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [ID] 1-3,10,13-15,17 * page 10, line 10 - page 12, line 7 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2016123333 (MOHTAR HANI [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] * * figures 2-3, 9, 10 *; | [YD]DE102015209704 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [YD] 1-3,6-17 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 1-4, 5d, 6-8 * | by applicant | DE102010026176 | WO2015091268 | DE102015209704 |