EP3555719 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE PINPOINT-ABILITY OF POTENTIAL ERRORS OF ONE OR MORE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEMANN, Philipp Justinus-Kerner-Weg 15 73614 Schorndorf / DE | 02 /
ZIELKE, Robert Manfred Drosselweg 16 71679 Asperg / DE | 03 /
WEISS, Patrick Washingtonring 130 71686 Remseck Am Neckar / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17832478.6 | 11.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017EP82213 | Priority number, date | DE201610225081 | 15.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016225081 | [2019/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018108809 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555719 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
G05B23/0275 (EP,US);
G05B23/024 (US);
G05B23/0272 (US);
G06F17/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER PINPOINT-FÄHIGKEIT MÖGLICHER FEHLER EINER ODER MEHRERER KOMPONENTEN | [2019/43] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE PINPOINT-ABILITY OF POTENTIAL ERRORS OF ONE OR MORE COMPONENTS | [2019/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA CAPACITÉ DE LOCALISATION PRÉCISE DE DÉFAILLANCES POSSIBLES D'AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 15.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/23] | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006077590 (FAVOWEB LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0023] *; | [A]DE102007041848 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0027] - [0031] *; | [A]EP2568433 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 9] , [0 15] - [0032] * |