EP3555099 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING BTK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUDRY, Danial c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
CRAVILLION, Theresa c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
GOSSELIN, Francis c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
LIM, Ngiap-Kie c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
MALHOTRA, Sushant c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 06 /
TIAN, Qingping c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Haiming c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 08 /
GMEHLING, Alexander Hemburnnstrasse 17 5605 Dottikon / CH | 09 /
FETTES, Alec c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 10 /
BACHMANN, Stephan c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 94080 Basel / CH | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Sauer, Frank F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17832491.9 | 13.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017EP82723 | Priority number, date | US201662434569P | 15.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662434569 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018109050 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555099 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3555099 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B01J31/2409 (CN,IL,KR,US);
B01J31/2414 (CN,IL,KR,US);
B01J2231/40 (CN,IL,KR,US);
B01J2531/824 (CN,IL,KR,US);
C07B2200/09 (CN,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BTK-INHIBITOREN | [2019/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING BTK INHIBITORS | [2019/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'INHIBITEURS DE BTK | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 15.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20189072.0 / EP3825317 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2017 | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | IT | 13.12.2021 | LU | 13.12.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.12.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 13.12.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 13.12.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 13.12.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 13.12.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
NO | 18.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]WO2013067274 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 58,59 * figures 1, 3, 7, 8, 10-12, 19, 21-22, 25 * * page 40; compound 130 * * page 164 - page 167; compounds 130a-130g, 130 * * Page 255, Scheme for the preparation of compound 191h * * Page 256, preparation of the compoung 191j * * Page 346, scheme for the preparation of compound 243g * * page 351; compound 245b * * Page 93, Suzuki coupling * * page 121; compound 107e * * page 141; compound 117e * * page 122; compound 108a * * page 276; example 199c * [A] 27-49 [Y] 50-57 [I] 1-26; | [A]WO2014056083 (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA]) [A] 19-22 * page 24, paragraph 3 *; | [XY]US2015158846 (CRAWFORD JAMES JOHN [US], et al) [X] 58,59 * page 40; compound 107f * * pages 34-35; example 103 *[Y] 50-57; | [XY]WO2016050921 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 58,59 * page 66; compound 3b * [Y] 50-57; | [A] - KHOJE A D ET AL, "Reactivity and regioselectivity in Stille couplings of 3-substituted 2,4-dichloropyridines", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 52, no. 4, ISSN 0040-4039, (20110126), pages 523 - 525, (20101221), XP027567759 [A] 5-9 * abstract * * SAcheme 2, page 524 * * page 524; example 1d; table 1 * | [A] - BARRY M. TROST ET AL, "Palladium-Catalyzed Dynamic Kinetic Asymmetric Transformations of Vinyl Aziridines with Nitrogen Heterocycles: Rapid Access to Biologically Active Pyrroles and Indoles", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20101110), vol. 132, no. 44, doi:10.1021/ja1071509, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 15800 - 15807, XP055478150 [A] 27-49 * abstract * * Scheme 1; page 15804 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja1071509 | by applicant | US2013116235 |