EP3558337 - METHODS OF TREATING IRRITABLE BOWEL SYNDROME WITH MODIFIED OR DELAYED RELEASE FORMULATIONS OF LINACLOTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 301 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHASH, Ahmad 5 Oland Lane Southborough, MA 01772 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Drywood, Rosalind Aerona, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Drywood, Rosalind Aerona, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17833050.2 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US67814 | Priority number, date | US201662437566P | 21.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662437566 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018119191 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558337 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/10, A61K47/32, A61P1/10 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61K38/10 (EP,EA);
A61K9/284 (EP,EA);
A61K47/32 (EA);
A61P1/10 (EP,EA)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | 16.07.2019 | ME | 16.07.2019 | Validation states | MA | 16.07.2019 | MD | 16.07.2019 | TN | 16.07.2019 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON REIZDARMSYNDROM MIT LINACLOTID-FORMULIERUNGEN MIT MODIFIZIERTER ODER VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2019/44] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING IRRITABLE BOWEL SYNDROME WITH MODIFIED OR DELAYED RELEASE FORMULATIONS OF LINACLOTIDE | [2019/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME DU CÔLON IRRITABLE AVEC DES FORMULATIONS À LIBÉRATION MODIFIÉE OU RETARDÉE DE LINACLOTIDE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2016197042 (IRONWOOD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-37,39-58 * page 2, paragraphs 6, 9 * * page 3, paragraph 12 - page 4, paragraph 13 * * page 8, paragraph 23 - page 11, paragraph 29 * * page 23, paragraph 54 * * page 24, paragraph 56 * * page 35, paragraphs 83, 86 * * page 36, paragraph 89 * * page 37, paragraph 92 * * page 38, paragraph 97 - page 40, paragraph 99 * * page 42, paragraph 106 * * page 50; example 3 * * page 77; example 17 * * claims 1, 5-8, 15, 30, 32, 35-36, 38 *[I] 1-58 | by applicant | US7304036 | US7371727 | US2010048489 | US2013190238 | US2015094272 |