EP3491592 - MPC WITH UNCONSTRAINED DEPENDENT VARIABLES FOR KPI PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O.Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRENCHARD, Andrew John HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
OGDEN-SWIFT, Andrew HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Corner House 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17834956.9 | 12.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US41661 | Priority number, date | US201615221755 | 28.07.2016 Original published format: US201615221755 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022298 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491592 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06F17/00 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06393 (EP,US);
G06Q10/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | MPC MIT UNEINGESCHRÄNKTEN ABHÄNGIGEN VARIABLEN ZUR LEISTUNGSANALYSE VON KPI | [2019/23] | English: | MPC WITH UNCONSTRAINED DEPENDENT VARIABLES FOR KPI PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS | [2019/23] | French: | MPC AVEC VARIABLES DÉPENDANTES NON CONTRAINTES POUR ANALYSE DE PERFORMANCES PAR KPI | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 12.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2022 | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/12] | 14.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 12.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011130850 (ZHENG QINGSHENG QUINN [US], et al) [I] 1-12* figure 7 * | International search | [A]WO0020939 (PAVILION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-12* See claims 1-15 and figure 1. *; | [X]US6666049 (KATENDE EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * See column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 6, column 5, lines 8-55 and claims 1-10. *; | [A]US2009204245 (SUSTAETA ANGEL [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0221]-[0231] and claims 1-8. *; | [A]US2011130850 (ZHENG QINGSHENG QUINN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0058],[0075], claims 1-26 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2014330402 (KEENAN MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See claims 1-11 and figure 1. * |