EP3490515 - ADJUSTABLE BED SYSTEMS WITH ROTATING ARTICULATING BED FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPJ, LLC 2 Carsha Drive Natick, MA 01760 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERMAN, Philip 7 Sleepy Lane Melville, New York 11747 / US | 02 /
MCCARTY, Philip 2 Carsha Drive Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | 03 /
SHIH, Chuan-Hang No.17 Lukung S. 2 Rd. Chang-Pin Industrial Park Lu-Kang Town Changhua County 505 / TW | 04 /
ESKRIDGE, Horace 723 Melrose Avenue Lexington, Kentucky 40502 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Whitfield, Gillian Janette Astrum ElementOne Limited Merlin House Langstone Newport NP18 2HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17835127.6 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US43754 | Priority number, date | US201662366920P | 26.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662366920 P | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022635 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490515 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/16, A61G7/002, A61G7/015 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
A61G7/16 (EP,US);
A61G7/015 (EP,US);
A61G7/018 (EP,US);
A61G7/1025 (US);
A61G5/14 (EP,US);
A61G7/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARE BETTSYSTEME MIT ROTIERENDEM GELENKIGEM BETTGESTELL | [2019/23] | English: | ADJUSTABLE BED SYSTEMS WITH ROTATING ARTICULATING BED FRAME | [2019/23] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE LIT RÉGLABLE À CADRE DE LIT ARTICULÉ ROTATIF | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8438680 (WURDEMAN BYRON WADE [US]) [X] 1-9,14 * figures 8-9 * [I] 10; | [I]US2013125310 (MANOUCHEHRI NIKOU [US]) [I] 1-10* figure 11 * | International search | [Y]US3786523 (SELE G) [Y] 18 * entire document *; | [Y]US4411035 (FENWICK LOEL [US]) [Y] 15 * entire document *; | [XY]US5497518 (IURA TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1, 2, 4, 5, 8-10, 14, 20 * entire document * [Y] 3, 6, 7, 11-13, 15, 18, 19; | [Y]US2005144720 (POULIN STEPHAN [CA], et al) [Y] 11-13 * entire document *; | [A]US2013007960 (MANOUCHEHRI NIKOU [US], et al) [A] 19 * entire document *; | [A]US2013125310 (MANOUCHEHRI NIKOU [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2013289770 (RAWLS-MEEHAN MARTIN B [US]) [Y] 1819 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015335508 (LIU TSUNG HSUAN [TW]) [Y] 3, 6, 7 * entire document * | by applicant | US5497518 | US8438680 | US2013125310 |