EP3487595 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE MOVEMENTS OF ARTICULATED RIGID BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTRL-labs Corporation 1001 6th Avenue 5th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | For all designated states CTRL-Labs Corporation 1001 6th Avenue 5th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | ||
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states CTRL-Labs Corporation 25 W. 36th Street 9th Floor New York, New York 10018 / US | ||
For all designated states Kaifosh, Patrick 430 West 116th Street, 1FW New York, New York 10027 / US | |||
For all designated states Machado, Tim 2269 Williams Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | |||
For all designated states Reardon, Thomas 34 W 74th Street, 4C New York, New York 10023 / US | |||
For all designated states Schomburg, Erik 279 Nassau Avenue No 3 Brooklyn, New York 11222 / US | |||
For all designated states Tong, Calvin 1115 39th Avenue E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAIFOSH, Patrick 1115 39th Avenue E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 02 /
MACHADO, Timothy 1115 39th Avenue E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 03 /
REARDON, Thomas 1115 39th Avenue E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 04 /
SCHOMBURG, Erik 1115 39th Avenue E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 05 /
TONG, Calvin 1115 39th Avenue E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17835140.9 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017US43791 | Priority number, date | US201662366426P | 25.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662366426 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022657 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487595 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00, A63F13/40, G06K9/62, G06K9/64, G06T7/20, G06T13/40, A61B5/11, A61B5/00 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
A61B5/1114 (EP,US);
A61B5/6813 (US);
A61B5/7264 (EP);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/744 (EP,US);
G01C21/18 (EP,US);
G06F18/2453 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/014 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V40/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | A63F13/00, A63F13/40, G06K9/62, G06K9/64, G06T7/20, G06T13/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER BEWEGUNGEN VON GELENKIGEN STARREN KÖRPERN | [2019/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE MOVEMENTS OF ARTICULATED RIGID BODIES | [2019/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DES MOUVEMENTS DE CORPS RIGIDES ARTICULÉS | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 11.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013232095 (TAN DESNEY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *; | [XI]US2016092504 (MITRI NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,15 * figures 2A, 4A-C, 6 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 2-4,6,9-14; | [IP] - TIMO VON MARCARD ET AL, "Sparse Inertial Poser: Automatic 3D Human Pose Estimation from Sparse IMUs", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170323), doi:10.1111/CGF.13131, XP080759137 [IP] 1-15 * figures 1, 3, 5, 7, 11 * * abstract * * page 350, column r, paragraph 2 - page 351, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 351, column l, paragraph l - page 355, column l, paragraph l * * page 355, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph l * * page 356, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 357, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 358, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/cgf.13131 | [A] - AL-MASHHADANY Y I, "Inverse Kinematics Problem (IKP) of 6-DOF Manipulator by Locally Recurrent Neural Networks (LRNNs)", MANAGEMENT AND SERVICE SCIENCE (MASS), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100824), ISBN 978-1-4244-5325-2, pages 1 - 5, XP031757259 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 3, column r, paragraph 1 * | International search | [A]US6005548 (LATYPOV NURAKHMED NURISLAMOVIC [SU], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US7089148 (BACHMANN ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 10,12-15, 18 * entire document * [Y] 7-9, 11, 16, 17, 19, 20; | [A]US7351975 (BRADY DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US7574253 (EDNEY PAUL A [US], et al) [Y] 7 * entire document *; | [Y]US7805386 (GREER DOUGLAS S [US]) [Y] 8 * entire document *; | [Y]US8435191 (BARBOUTIS GRIGORIOS [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document *; | [Y]US8484022 (VANHOUCKE VINCENT [US]) [Y] 9 * entire document *; | [A]US2014092009 (YEN WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014098018 (KIM DAVID [GB], et al) [Y] 17, 19, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US8890875 (JAMMES FABIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]WO2014194257 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2015157944 (GOTTLIEB GLENN I [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015193949 (KATZ DOV [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9235934 (MANDELLA MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9240069 (LI ADAM [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2016041088 (SULON TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [Y] 16 * entire document * | by applicant | US2016092504 |