EP3487457 - ADAPTIVE SYSTEM FOR DERIVING CONTROL SIGNALS FROM MEASUREMENTS OF NEUROMUSCULAR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/47] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Facebook Technologies, LLC. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [2019/51] | For all designated states CTRL-Labs Corporation 1001 6th Avenue 5th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | ||
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states CTRL-Labs Corporation 25 W. 36th Street 9th Floor New York, New York 10018 / US | ||
For all designated states Kaifosh, Patrick 430 West 116th Street 1FW New York, New York 10027 / US | |||
For all designated states Machado, Tim 2269 Williams Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | |||
For all designated states Reardon, Thomas 34 W 74th Street 4C New York, New York 10023 / US | |||
For all designated states Schomburg, Erik 279 Nassau Avenue 3 Brooklyn, New York 11222 / US | |||
For all designated states Merel, Joshua 84 Mildmay Avenue London N1 4FE / GB | |||
For all designated states Demers, Steven 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAIFOSH, Patrick 430 West 116Th, 1FW New York, NY 10027 / US | 02 /
MACHADO, Timothy 2269 Williams Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
REARDON, Thomas 34 W 74th Street, 4C New York, NY 10023 / US | 04 /
SCHOMBURG, Erik 279 Nassau Avenue, 3 Brooklyn, NY 11222 / US | 05 /
MEREL, Joshua 84 Mildmay Avenue London N1 4FE / GB | 06 /
DEMERS, Steven 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2019/22] | 01 /
KAIFOSH, Patrick 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | ||
02 /
MACHADO, Timothy 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | |||
03 /
REARDON, Thomas 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | |||
04 /
SCHOMBURG, Erik 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | |||
05 /
MEREL, Joshua 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / GB | |||
06 /
DEMERS, Steven 471 Silver Street 207 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/22] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17835141.7 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017US43792 | Priority number, date | US201662366427P | 25.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662366427 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022658 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487457 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3487457 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/68, A61F2/70, A61B5/00, A61F2/72, G06F3/01 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/72 (EP,US);
A61B5/1106 (US);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/378 (US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
G06F3/014 (EP);
G06F3/015 (EP);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | A61F2/68, A61F2/70, A61F2/72, A61B5/0488, A61B5/0492, A61B5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/22] | A61F2/68, A61F2/70, A61F2/72, G06F15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES SYSTEM ZUR ABLEITUNG VON STEUERSIGNALEN AUS MESSUNGEN DER NEUROMUSKULÄREN AKTIVITÄT | [2019/22] | English: | ADAPTIVE SYSTEM FOR DERIVING CONTROL SIGNALS FROM MEASUREMENTS OF NEUROMUSCULAR ACTIVITY | [2019/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ADAPTATIF PERMETTANT DE DÉRIVER DES SIGNAUX DE COMMANDE À PARTIR DE MESURES DE L'ACTIVITÉ NEUROMUSCULAIRE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008022435 (SEYED MOMEN KAVEH [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-15 * pages 6,12-15 *; | [X]US2009327171 (TAN DESNEY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-15* paragraphs [0026] - [0053] *; | [X]US2014240103 (LAKE STEPHEN [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] , [0095] - [0105]; figures 2A, 5 * | International search | [XY]US2010293115 (SEYED MOMEN KAVEH [US]) [X] 1-3, 8-10, 15-20 * entire document * [Y] 4-7, 11-14; | [Y]US2015084860 (ALEEM IDRIS S [CA], et al) [Y] 11-14* entire document *; | [Y] - DELIS et al., "DEVELOPMENT OF A MYOELECTRIC CONTROLLER BASED ON KNEE ANGLE ESTIMATION", International Conference on Biomedical Electronics and Devices, (20090117), pages 97 - 103, URL: http://www.ene.unb.br/joaoluiz/pdf/biodevices2009_kneeangle.pdf, (20170919), XP055459126 [Y] 4, 5 | [Y] - DIENER et al., "Direct conversion from facial myoelectric signals to speech using Deep Neural Networks", 2015 International Joint Conference on Neural Networks (IJCNN, (20151001), URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/f18f/b8611684874f93feb417279530e50c3d800e.pdf, (20170919), XP033221885 [Y] 6, 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IJCNN.2015.7280404 | by applicant | US2014240103 |