EP3490550 - A2-73 AS A THERAPEUTIC FOR INSOMNIA, ANXIETY, AND AGITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anavex Life Sciences Corp. 51 West 52nd Street New York, NY 10019 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISSLING, Christopher Anavex Life Sciences Corp. 51 West 52nd Street New York NY 10019 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 17835251.4 | 27.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US44111 | Priority number, date | US201662367253P | 27.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662367253 P | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022848 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490550 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/341, C07D307/14, A61P25/28, A61K31/13 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | A2-73 ALS THERAPEUTISCHES MITTEL GEGEN SCHLAFLOSIGKEIT, ANGST UND UNRUHE | [2019/23] | English: | A2-73 AS A THERAPEUTIC FOR INSOMNIA, ANXIETY, AND AGITATION | [2019/23] | French: | A2-73 EN TANT QU'AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE CONTRE L'INSOMNIE, L'ANXIÉTÉ ET L'AGITATION | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 14.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2017132127 (ANAVEX LIFE SCIENCES CORP [US]) | International search | [Y]US2011021552 (BERG JAMES [US]) [Y] 8, 9 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016022653 (DOOLEY THOMAS P [US]) [Y] 10* entire document *; | [XY] - "Anavex Announces Two-Year Clinical Extension Study of ANAVEX 2-73 and Presents Phase 2a Dose-Response Analysis at AAT Conference", Press Release, (20160310), URL: http://www.anavex.com/anavex-announces-two-year-clinical-extension-study-of-anavex-2-73-an d-presents-phase-2a-dose-response-analysis-at-aat-conference, (20170914), XP055459569 [X] 1-7, 11 * entire document * [Y] 8-10 | by applicant | US2011021552 | US2016022653 | WO2017132127 | - PETIT et al., "Regulation of neuron-astrocyte metabolic coupling across the sleep-wake cycle", Neurosci, (20160000), vol. 323, doi:10.1016/j.neuroscience.2015.12.007, pages 135 - 156, XP029489447 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroscience.2015.12.007 | - OSTERGAARD et al., "Associations between Potentially Modifiable Risk Factors and Alzheimer Disease: A Mendelian Randomization Study", PLOS Medicine, (20150616), URL: https://doi.rg/10.1371/journal.pmed.1001841 | - ZADNYS et al., "Sleep Disturbances in the Elderly", Psychiatr Clin North Am, (20151200), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 723 - 41 | - KHALSA, "Stress, Meditation, and Alzheimer's Disease Prevention: Where The Evidence Stands", J Alzheimers Dis, (20150000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 1 - 12 | - KUIPER et al., "Comparison of cognitive functioning as measured by the Ruff Figural Fluency Test and the CogState computerized battery within the LifeLines Cohort Study", BMC Psychol, (20170512), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s40359-017-0185-0, page 15, XP021244986 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40359-017-0185-0 | - KARMAIL et al., "Global Risk Assessment to Guide Blood Pressure Management in Cardiovascular Disease Prevention", Hypertension, vol. 69, (20170000), pages e2 - e9, URL: https://doi.ora/10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.116.08249 | - DARBY et al., "Intraindividual cognitive decline using a brief computerized cognitive screening test", Alzheimer's and Dementia, (20120000), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 95 - 104 | - MARUFF et al., "Clinical utility of the Cogstate brief battery in identifying cognitive impairment in mild cognitive impairment and Alzheimer's disease", BMC Pharmacology & Toxicology, (20130000), vol. 1, doi:10.1186/2050-7283-1-30, page 30, XP021173872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/2050-7283-1-30 | US19620622870 | WO2016US42937 | WO2016US42958 | WO2016US42949 |