EP3557997 - MIXTURES OF BEFLUBUTAMID OR OPTICALLY ENRICHED FORMS THEREOF WITH A SECOND HERBICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Corporation FMC Tower at Cira Centre South 2929 Walnut Street Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINN, Sandra, L. 1351 Jacksonville Road Columbia, NJ 08022 / US | 02 /
D'AMICO, Frank, J., Jr. 50 Walters Road Robbinsville, NJ 08691 / US | 03 /
DUUS, Joachim Rønøvej 6 3630 Jægerspris / DK | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17835905.5 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US68077 | Priority number, date | US201662437963P | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662437963 P | US201762471444P | 15.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762471444 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018119338 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557997 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N39/02, A01P13/02, A01N33/22, A01N37/22, A01N37/26, A01N37/40, A01N41/06, A01N43/10, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/70, A01N43/707, A01N43/76, A01N43/80, A01N43/84 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A01N39/02 (EP,KR);
A01N47/12 (EP,US);
A01N33/22 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/20 (US);
A01N37/22 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/26 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N41/06 (EP,KR);
A01N43/10 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/70 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/707 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/84 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/30 (EP,US);
A01N57/20 (EP,US);
A01N35/10 (US);
A01N39/04 (US);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/40, A01N39/02, A01N43/40 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N33/18, A01N33/22, A01N35/10, A01N37/20, A01N37/26, A01N37/40, A01N39/04, A01N41/06, A01N41/10, A01N43/10, A01N43/40, A01N43/50, A01N43/54, A01N43/653, A01N43/70, A01N43/707, A01N43/76, A01N43/80, A01N43/80, A01N43/84, A01N43/90, A01N47/12, A01N47/30, A01N47/30, A01N57/20 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N37/20 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N37/26 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N43/10 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N43/653 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N43/70 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N43/707 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N43/80 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N43/90 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N47/30 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N47/36 (EP);
A01N39/02, A01N57/20 (EP);
A01N43/40, A01N35/10, A01N37/20, A01N37/26, A01N37/40, A01N39/04, A01N41/06, A01N41/10, A01N43/10, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/70, A01N43/707, A01N43/76, A01N43/80, A01N43/80, A01N43/84, A01N43/90, A01N47/12, A01N47/30, A01N47/36, A01N57/20 (EP)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | MISCHUNGEN VON BEFLUBUTAMID ODER OPTISCH ANGEREICHERTEN FORMEN DAVON MIT EINEM ZWEITEN HERBIZID | [2019/44] | English: | MIXTURES OF BEFLUBUTAMID OR OPTICALLY ENRICHED FORMS THEREOF WITH A SECOND HERBICIDE | [2019/44] | French: | MÉLANGES DE BEFLUBUTAMIDE OU DE FORMES OPTIQUEMENT ENRICHIES DE CELUI-CI AVEC UN SECOND HERBICIDE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 21.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.02.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2024 | Decision despatched | 17.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2003212704 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2,5-7 * columns 1-11; example -; claim - * [I] 1-12; | [X]US2006063677 (KOTZIAN GEORG R [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] - [0019]; example -; claim - *; | [XI]WO2006063834 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 36; claim - * [I] 1-12; | [ID]CN102334483B (SHAANXI MEIBANG PESTICIDE CO) [ID] 1-12* example -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0239414 | EP0352992 | US4929273 | EP0901753 | WO2007101587 | WO2009029518 | CN102283199 | CN102326552 | CN102302017B | CN102326565B | CN102283234B | CN102334483B | CN102258021B | CN102258028B | CN102326550B | CN105519531 | - P. M. L. TAMES, Neth. J. Plant Pathology, (19640000), vol. 70, pages 73 - 80 | - S. R. COLBY, "Calculating Synergistic and Antagonistic Responses of Herbicide Combinations", Weeds, (19670000), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 |