EP3560046 - BUSHING WITH INTEGRATED ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JADHAV, Ranjit Survey No 224 Panhala Shiv Datta Nagar Pimpri Goan Pune 411017 / IN | 02 /
LAMMERS, Arend Louis Bouwmeesterstraat 117 7558 TV Hengelo / NL | 03 /
PINGALE, Rahul Damodar Housing Society Indira Nagar Bibvewadi, Pune 411037 / IN | 04 /
DAS, Amritendu Vill+Po Maligram Ps Pingla Midnapore west West Bengal Pin 721140 / IN | [2021/08] |
Former [2019/44] | 01 /
JADHAV, Ranjit Survey No 224 Panhala Shiv Datta Nagar Pimpri Goan Pune 411017 / IN | ||
02 /
LAMMERS, Arend Louis Bouwmeesterstraat 117 7558 TV Hengelo / NL | |||
03 /
PINGALE, Rahul Damodar Housing Society Indira Nagar Bibvewadi Pune 411037 / IN | |||
04 /
DAS, Amritendu Vill+Po Maligram Ps Pingla Midnapore west West Bengal Pin 721140 / IN | Representative(s) | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Intellectual Power Limited Eaton House 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges / CH | Application number, filing date | 17835934.5 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017EP83664 | Priority number, date | IN201611043504 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: IN201611043504 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018115027 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560046 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560046 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/26, H01R13/66, H01B17/00, H01R4/64, H01F27/04 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/665 (EP,US);
H01B17/005 (EP,US);
H01B17/26 (EP,US);
H01F27/04 (EP,US);
H01R4/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | H01R13/66, H01B17/00, H01R4/64, H01F27/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUCHSE MIT INTEGRIERTER ELEKTRONIK | [2019/44] | English: | BUSHING WITH INTEGRATED ELECTRONICS | [2019/44] | French: | DOUILLE À ÉLECTRONIQUE INTÉGRÉE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 25.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2017 | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2678115 (SOFRELA [FR]) [X] 1,3,6,8,11 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,5,7,9,10; | [A]US2008024116 (ALBERT CLEMENS [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2013113954 |