EP3469933 - DISPOSABLE CIGARETTE CARTRIDGE, ATOMIZER, AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Tobacco Hunan Industrial Co., Ltd. 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha, Hunan 410007 / CN | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jianfu 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 02 /
ZHONG, Kejun 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Xiaoyi 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Wei 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 05 /
DAI, Yuangang 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 06 /
YIN, Xinqiang 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 07 /
YI, Jianhua 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 08 /
YU, Hong 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 09 /
HE, Youlin 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 10 /
ZHOU, Yongquan 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17836188.7 | 02.05.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017CN82734 | Priority number, date | CN201610631410 | 04.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610631410 | CN201621140740U | 20.10.2016 Original published format: CN 201621140740 U | CN201621401164U | 20.12.2016 Original published format: CN 201621401164 U | [2019/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018024004 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3469933 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3469933 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/05 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A24F40/05 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR,US);
A24B15/167 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/44 (US);
A24F40/46 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | A24F47/00, A24F40/05 | ||
Former IPC [2019/16] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEGZIGARETTENPATRONE, ZERSTÄUBER UND ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2019/16] | English: | DISPOSABLE CIGARETTE CARTRIDGE, ATOMIZER, AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2019/16] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE CIGARETTE JETABLE, ATOMISEUR ET CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | Translation filed | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 05.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015018120 (LIN GUANGRONG [CN]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]CN105795526 (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-22* abstract * | International search | [A]EP2829183 (LIU TUANFANG [CN]) [A] 1-35* , the whole document *; | [A]US2015047658 (CYPHERT GILBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN104770900 (SHANGHAI RUYUN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0008]-[0014], and figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN204861187U (WANG SHENYI) [X] 1-2 * , description, paragraphs [0026]-[0027], and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN105559151 (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN105795526 (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN205947126U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-26 * , description, paragraphs [0064]-[0083], and figures 1-12 *; | [PX]CN206025228U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0051], and figures 1-8 *; | [PX]CN206043434U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0039]-[0064], and figures 1-6 *; | [PX]CN206043450U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0034]-[0045], and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN206119184U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0036]-[0048], and figures 1-7 *; | [PX]CN206119185U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-9, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0035]-[0047], and figures 1-7 * |