EP3495408 - RUBBER MEMBER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIONO Saaya c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
HASHIGUCHI Makoto c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 03 /
TODA Takumi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 17837038.3 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017JP28136 | Priority number, date | JP20160152220 | 02.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016152220 | JP20160152218 | 02.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016152218 | [2019/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018025936 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3495408 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/04, B60C1/00, C08J7/06, C08K3/00, C08K5/00, C08L21/00, C08L101/14, C08K9/04, C08L7/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J7/06 (EP,US);
C08J9/04 (EP,US);
C08J9/103 (US);
C08J9/104 (US);
C08K3/00 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K5/00 (US);
C08K5/05 (US);
C08K7/02 (US);
C08K9/04 (US);
C08L101/14 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (US);
C08K2201/004 (US);
C08K2201/011 (US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K7/10 (US);
C08K7/14 (US);
C08L2312/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08K7/02 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08K7/10 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08K7/14 (EP,US);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08L101/14 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/24] | C08J9/04, B60C1/00, C08J7/06, C08K3/00, C08K5/00, C08L21/00, C08L101/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | GUMMIELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND REIFEN | [2019/24] | English: | RUBBER MEMBER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND TIRE | [2019/24] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ, ET PNEU | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2019 | Translation filed | 01.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 23.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009144032 ; | [A]JP2009167340 ; | [A]WO2011073188 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2698397 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 46, Database accession no. 2009-K94495, XP002792382 & JP2009144032 A 20090702 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 52, Database accession no. 2009-M01614, XP002792383 & JP2009167340 A 20090730 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO9734776 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text & US 6336487 B1 Whole Document & EP 826522 A1 *; | [A]JP2008260889 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2012111799 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1, 2, 4, 7, 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0007], [0027], [0033] to [0045], [0073] to [0077], [0082] to [0086]; tables 1 to 4; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-7, 9 [A] 8; | [YA]JP2013241566 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-7, 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0002] to [0010], [0025] to [0026], [0036]; examples & US 2013/0281610 A1 claims; paragraphs [0002] to [0009], [0024] to [0025], [0036]; examples & DE 102013207122 A1 & CN 103374150 A * [A] 8; | [A]JP5940192B (Shin-ei Kako Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-9* , entire text & WO 2016/159081 A1 Whole Document * | by applicant | JP2014227487 |