|
21.09.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
22.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |