13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
23.09.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
15.10.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
07.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.06.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
23.03.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
27.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.01.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
15.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.06.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
13.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
13.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|