02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
22.03.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
15.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
14.04.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.04.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.09.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.05.2021 |
First examination report |
|
14.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.12.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
06.12.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
06.12.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
11.10.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
17.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.02.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
27.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|