EP3499309 - LIGHT-SOURCE SYSTEM AND PROJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPOTRONICS CORPORATION LIMITED 20F-22F, High-Tech Zone Union Tower No. 63, Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Fei 20F-22F, High-Tech Zone Union Tower 63, Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Zuqiang 20F-22F, High-Tech Zone Union Tower 63, Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yi 20F-22F, High-Tech Zone Union Tower 63, Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17838372.5 | 21.04.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017CN81490 | Priority number, date | CN201610649657 | 09.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610649657 | [2019/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018028240 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499309 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/20, // G03B33/08 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G03B21/204 (EP,CN,US);
G03B21/2013 (EP,CN,US);
G03B21/206 (US);
G02B26/008 (US);
G03B21/20 (US);
G03B21/2033 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | G03B21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENSYSTEM UND PROJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/25] | English: | LIGHT-SOURCE SYSTEM AND PROJECTION DEVICE | [2019/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE ET DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2019 | Translation filed | 04.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 26.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2013215397 (MATSUBARA MASATERU [JP]); | [XAY]US2013258639 (HU FEI [CN], et al); | [XAY]US2014268069 (TAKAHASHI TATSUYA [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2015019724 (JVC KENWOOD CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]CN202306114U (BENQ CORP) [A] 11* , the whole document *; | [X]CN102566230 (YLX CHINA CORP) [X] 1-9, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0066]-[0071], and figures 5-7 *; | [X]CN203745790U (SHENZHEN ESTAR DISPLAYTECH CO) [X] 1, 3-7, 10, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0045], and figures 1-4 *; | [XY]CN104765238 (SHENZHEN ESTAR DISPLAYTECH CO) [X] 1, 3-7, 10, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0045], and figures 1-4, description, paragraphs [0037]-[0045], and figures 1-4 * [Y] 11; | [X]CN104765240 (SHENZHEN ESTAR DISPLAYTECH CO) [X] 1, 3-7, 10, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0045], and figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN104914657 (YILI RUIGUANG TECHNOLOGY DEV SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-9, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0067]-[0072] and figures 5-7 *; | [X]CN204759006U (YILI RUIGUANG TECHNOLOGY DEV SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-9, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0083]-[0085], and figure 11 *; | [Y]CN105116675 (HISENSE GROUP) [Y] 11 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0051], and figure 6 *; | [A]US2015354787 (CHANG KEH-SU [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN205992115U (YILI RUIGUANG TECH DEV (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [PX] 1-16 * , claims 1-16 * |