EP3498779 - CURABLE PARTICULATE SILICONE COMPOSITION, SEMICONDUCTOR MEMBER COMPRISING CURABLE PARTICULATE SILICONE COMPOSITION, AND MOLDING METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR MEMBER COMPRISING CURABLE PARTICULATE SILICONE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Toray Co., Ltd. 2-24, Higashishinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI Ryosuke c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17839358.3 | 04.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017JP28385 | Priority number, date | JP20160155384 | 08.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016155384 | [2019/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018030287 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498779 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08J5/00, C08K3/00, H01L21/56, H01L23/29, H01L23/31 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP,KR);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08G77/80 (US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29C45/14639 (US);
C08J5/00 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08K3/00 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/10 (KR);
H01L21/56 (KR,US);
H01L21/565 (US);
H01L23/29 (US);
H01L23/296 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/31 (US);
B29C2045/0091 (US);
B29K2083/00 (US);
B29K2509/02 (US);
B29K2995/0005 (US);
B29L2031/3406 (US);
C08G77/12 (EP);
C08G77/20 (EP);
C08J2383/04 (EP);
C08K2003/2227 (US);
C08K2003/2241 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08K3/36 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE TEILCHENFÖRMIGE SILIKONZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HALBLEITERELEMENT MIT HÄRTBARER TEILCHENFÖRMIGER SILIKONZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMVERFAHREN FÜR HALBLEITERELEMENT MIT HÄRTBARER TEILCHENFÖRMIGER SILIKONZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/25] | English: | CURABLE PARTICULATE SILICONE COMPOSITION, SEMICONDUCTOR MEMBER COMPRISING CURABLE PARTICULATE SILICONE COMPOSITION, AND MOLDING METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR MEMBER COMPRISING CURABLE PARTICULATE SILICONE COMPOSITION | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SILICONE PARTICULAIRE DURCISSABLE, ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR COMPRENANT LA COMPOSITION DE SILICONE PARTICULAIRE DURCISSABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE POUR ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR COMPRENANT LA COMPOSITION DE SILICONE PARTICULAIRE DURCISSABLE | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2019 | Translation filed | 11.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 07.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015194158 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-14 * examples 9,11 * [I] 5,15,16; | [P]EP3159369 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [P] * examples 9,11 ** paragraph [0078] * | International search | [X]JP2007332259 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-16 * , *; | [X]JP2008019424 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-16 * , *; | [X]JP2009235368 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-16 * , *; | [X]WO2013051600 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * , *; | [A]WO2015194158 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]WO2016103654 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]JP2016124967 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [PA]WO2016136243 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-16* , & TW 201638222 A * | by applicant | WO2013051600 | JP2013076050 | JP2013221075 | JP2014009322 | WO2016038836 | WO2016JP00959 |