EP3496837 - AIR FILTER CONDITION SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARTHUR, Jonathan B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BLOEDORN, Karl W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
CHAKRAVARTY, Jayant 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
PORTELLI, Gene B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
GLASS, Dennis M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
MEIS, Michael A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
LUPPES, Lyle L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
HENNEN, Daniel W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
FLETCHER, Douglas D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
HEMBERG, Eric O. Unit 51A Tower 9 The Palazzo 28 Lok King Street Fo Tan, Shatin NT Hong Kong / CN | 11 /
HEMBERG, Oscar M. Dalarö Skansväg 13770 Dalarö / SE | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17840056.0 | 04.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017US45492 | Priority number, date | US201662372156P | 08.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662372156 P | US201662374040P | 12.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662374040 P | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018031403 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496837 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496837 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/00, B01D46/42, B01D46/10, B01D46/44, B01D46/52 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
B01D46/0086 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/009 (EP);
B01D46/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/42 (KR);
B01D46/429 (EP,US);
B01D46/446 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/521 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/39 (EP,KR);
G01L13/00 (US);
G01L19/086 (KR,US);
G01N15/0826 (EP);
H04W4/33 (US);
H04W4/38 (KR,US);
H04W4/80 (US);
F24F2110/40 (KR);
G01N2015/084 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | B01D46/00, B01D46/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG EINES LUFTFILTERZUSTANDES | [2019/25] | English: | AIR FILTER CONDITION SENSING | [2019/25] | French: | DÉTECTION DE L'ÉTAT D'UN FILTRE À AIR | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 13.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2017 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | MT | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | IE | 04.08.2021 | LU | 04.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 04.08.2017 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 04.08.2017 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012318073 (ZAVODNY LUDEK [CZ], et al); | [Y]US2013197829 (SHERMAN III WILLIAM [US], et al); | [XAY]US2015052978 (BEIER MICHAEL B [US]); | [XI]US2015260424 (FADELL ANTHONY MICHAEL [US], et al); | [XY]US2016045854 (HUNG CHEN-YU [TW], et al) | International search | [A]US2006259273 (GOLDBERG GARY [US]); | [A]US8029608 (BRESLIN STEWART [US]); | [A]US2012318073 (ZAVODNY LUDEK [CZ], et al); | [X]US2015052978 (BEIER MICHAEL B [US]); | [A]CN105435526 (QINGDAO BOLIER MACHINERY EQUIPMENT CO LTD) |