EP3496727 - CONSTRUCTS AND METHODS FOR SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELDSTEIN, Paul A. 2001 7th Avenue Sacramento, CA 95616 / US | 02 /
POLLACK, Marc 2950 Portage Bay W Apt. 503 Davis, CA 95616 / US | 03 /
FALK, Bryce 713 Peregrine Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17840263.2 | 10.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017US46260 | Priority number, date | US201662374746P | 12.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662374746 P | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018031751 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496727 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/713, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12N15/11, C12N15/85, C12P19/34, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6816, C12Q1/6865 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6865 (EP);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12N15/85 (EP);
C12Q1/68 (EP);
C12Q1/6816 (EP);
C12Q1/6832 (US);
C12N2830/60 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2521/119, C12Q2521/327, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2525/204, C12Q2525/301, C12Q2565/501 (EP);
C12Q1/6865, C12Q2521/119, C12Q2521/327, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2525/204, C12Q2525/301, C12Q2565/501 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61K31/713, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12N15/11, C12N15/85, C12P19/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALVERSTÄRKUNG | [2019/25] | English: | CONSTRUCTS AND METHODS FOR SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION | [2019/25] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'AMPLIFICATION DE SIGNAUX. | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2007087262 (COMPASS GENETICS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13 * figure 3; claims * [A] 4,5 [I] 14,15; | [Y]US2007110722 (OBREGON DEMIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,13 * figure 1; [0008]; claims *; | [Y]EP0427074 (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,13 * claims; examples * | International search | [A]US2008207539 (ARBUTHNOT PATRICK [ZA], et al) [A] 1-3, 15-17, 25-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2006074041 (JOHNSTON BRIAN H [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 15-17, 25-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2009298909 (PACHUK CATHERINE J [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 15-17, 25-27 * entire document *; | [A] - BRUMMELKAMP et al., "A system for stable expression of short interfering RNAs in mammalian cells", Science, (20020419), vol. 296, no. 5567, pages 550 - 553, XP 002626048 [A] 1-3, 15-17, 25-27 * . entire document * | [A] - SUI et al., "A DNA vector-based RNAi technology to suppress gene expression in mammalian cells", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20020416), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 5515 - 5520, XP002964701 [A] 1-3, 15-17, 25-27 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.082117599 |