|
14.06.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
26.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
28.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |