06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
24.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
16.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.06.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.05.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
26.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
23.03.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.11.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
11.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.04.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
22.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
22.11.2019 |
First examination report |
|
22.11.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
05.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
05.03.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
01.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
01.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
07.12.2018 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
01.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.05.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.05.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
17.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|