EP3328887 - ANTI-GM-CSF ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I-Mab Biopharma (Hangzhou) Co., Ltd. 6F, No.3 Bld., Hexiang Technology Center Qiantang New Area Hangzhou Zhejiang / CN | [2021/25] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states I-Mab Biopharma Co., Ltd. Rm802, 8F, 1Bld., West Tower 88 Shangke Rd. Pudong Shanghai, 201210 / CN | ||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states I-Mab Biopharma US Limited 9801 Washingtonian Blvd, Suite 710 Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | ||
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states I-MAB Grand Pavilion, Hibiscus Way 802 West Bay Road PO Box 31119 Cayman KY1-1205 / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhengyi Suite 802, West Tower OmniVision Tech Park 88 Shangke Road Pudong New District Shanghai 201210 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Lei Suite 802, West Tower OmniVision Tech Park 88 Shangke Road Pudong New District Shanghai 201210 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Bingshi Suite 802, West Tower OmniVision Tech Park 88 Shangke Road Pudong New District Shanghai 201210 / CN | 04 /
ZANG, Jingwu Suite 802, West Tower OmniVision Tech Park 88 Shangke Road Pudong New District Shanghai 201210 / CN | [2019/21] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
WANG, Zhengyi Suite 219 Building 6 Chamtime Plaza 2889 Jingke Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | ||
02 /
FANG, Lei Suite 219 Building 6 Chamtime Plaza 2889 Jingke Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | |||
03 /
GUO, Bingshi Suite 219 Building 6 Chamtime Plaza 2889 Jingke Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | |||
04 /
ZANG, Jingwu Suite 219 Building 6 Chamtime Plaza 2889 Jingke Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/23] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17840546.0 | 18.09.2017 | [2018/23] | WO2017CN102057 | Priority number, date | CN201610831525 | 19.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610831525 | CN201610832677 | 19.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610832677 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018050111 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328887 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3328887 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/24, A61P37/06, A61P35/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61P19/02 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/24 (IL,US);
C07K16/243 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (IL);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,US);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL,US);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/6863 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/30 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (KR);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (KR);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/75 (IL);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/94 (EP,US);
G01N2333/535 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | C07K16/24, C12N15/13, A61K39/395, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, A61P35/02, A61P19/02, G01N33/577, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-GM-CSF-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2018/23] | English: | ANTI-GM-CSF ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2018/23] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-GM-CSF ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 22.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.04.2021 | 15.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | IE | 18.09.2021 | LU | 18.09.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.09.2021 | ||
LU | 18.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.09.2021 | ||
LU | 18.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.09.2021 | ||
LU | 18.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 18.09.2021 | ||
LU | 18.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 18.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | EE | 18.08.2021 | |
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 18.08.2021 | |
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HR | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
BG | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007092939 (MORPHOTEK INC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0042] , [0043] , [0054] - [0056] - [0139] - [0141] *; | [I]WO2008064321 (KALOBIOS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0021] - [0022] - [0042] - [0122] - [0133]; tables 1,2 *; | [I]WO2008141391 (CRC FOR ASHTMA AND AIRWAYS LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-12 * pages 2-5; tables 1,2 * * page 9, line 10 - page 11, line 21 * * examples 1-3,5,6; table 7 *; | [I]WO2010071923 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al) [I] 1-11,15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020] - [0031] , [0034] , [0038] , [0039] , [0052]; examples 2-6,8-11 *; | [I]WO2010124163 (THERACLONE SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0105] , [0106] , [0121] - [0127]; examples 1,2,7 *; | [I]WO2011153592 (CRC FOR ASTHMA AND AIRWAYS LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 2, line 8 - page 5, line 22 * * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 10 * * page 15, lines 2-14 * * page 15, line 16 - page 16, line 14; examples 1,2,4 *; | [I]US8268311 (KIRCHNER JACQUELINE A [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * column 3, line 60 - column 9, line 59; examples 1-2,4,5,6 *; | [I]EP2535353 (EVEC INC [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0037] , [0252] - [0335]; tables A,B *; | [I]US2014065163 (MAGNENAT LAURENT [CH], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [0028] - [0032] - [0061] - [0063] - [0080] - [0082] - [0088] - [0089] *; | [I]WO2014138862 (SCHRADER JOHN [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0019] , [0023] - [0027] - [0059] - [0061] - [0104] - [0106]; table 2 *; | [I]WO2015028657 (TAKEDA GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-12,15 * page 2, line 18 - page 7, line 20 * * page 28, line 14 - page 89, line 5 *; | [I] - CRIS S. CONSTANTINESCU ET AL, "Randomized phase 1b trial of MOR103, a human antibody to GM-CSF, in multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY - NEUROIMMUNOLOGY NEUROINFLAMMATION, (20150521), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1212/NXI.0000000000000117, page e117, XP055540931 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1212/NXI.0000000000000117 | [I] - PULJIC ET AL, "Lipopolysaccharide-induced lung inflammation is inhibited by neutralization of GM-CSF", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACO, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, (20070203), vol. 557, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.EJPHAR.2006.11.023, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 230 - 235, XP005872830 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.4] , [02.5] , [03.4] , [03.5] , [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2006.11.023 | [I] - KRINNER E M ET AL, "A human monoclonal IgG1 potently neutralizing the pro-inflammatory cytokine GM-CSF", MOLECULAR IMMUNOL, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 44, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.MOLIMM.2006.03.020, ISSN 0161-5890, (20070201), pages 916 - 925, (20060511), XP005663412 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.1] , [02.5] , [02.6] , [03.1] , [03.2] , [03.3] , [03.5] , [03.7] , [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2006.03.020 | [I] - FRANK BEHRENS ET AL, "First in Patient Study of Anti-GM-CSF Monoclonal Antibody (MOR103) in Active Rheumatoid Arthritis: Results of a Phase 1b/2a Randomized, Double-Blind, Placebo-Controlled Trial", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM; ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOGY AND ASSOCIATION-OF-RHEUMATOLOGY-HE; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; NOVEMBER 10 -14, 2012, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, US, vol. 64, no. 12, ISSN 0004-3591, (20121201), pages 4171 - 4172, (20121128), XP002733081 [I] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - AOI SHIOMI ET AL, "GM-CSF as a therapeutic target in autoimmune diseases", INFLAMMATION AND REGENERATION, (20160705), vol. 36, no. 8, doi:10.1186/s41232-016-0014-5, pages 1 - 9, XP055338930 [A] 12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s41232-016-0014-5 | [A] - HAMILTON J A, "GM-CSF in inflammation and autoimmunity", TRENDS IN IMMUNO, ELSEVIER LTD. * TRENDS JOURNALS, GB, (20020801), vol. 23, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S1471-4906(02)02260-3, ISSN 1471-4906, pages 403 - 408, XP004371500 [A] 12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4906(02)02260-3 |