EP3726998 - OPTICAL ASSESSMENT OF MATTER PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/44] | OPTICALLY ASSESSING BODY PROPERTIES | ||
[2021/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eger, Horst Rebhuhnwinkel 8 16356 Ahrensfelde / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte Kekuléstrasse 2-4 12489 Berlin / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 17840551.0 | 19.12.2017 | [2020/44] | WO2017DE101085 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019120342 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726998 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3726998 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A22C17/0073 (EP,US);
A22C15/008 (US);
A22C17/0006 (US);
A22C17/0033 (US);
A22C17/0086 (US);
G01N33/12 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06T7/0004 (US);
G06T7/62 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/56 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE BEWERTUNG VON KÖRPEREIGENSCHAFTEN | [2020/44] | English: | OPTICAL ASSESSMENT OF MATTER PROPERTIES | [2021/47] | French: | ÉVALUATION OPTIQUE DES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UN CORPS | [2021/47] |
Former [2020/44] | OPTICALLY ASSESSING BODY PROPERTIES | ||
Former [2020/44] | ÉVALUATION OPTIQUE DE PROPRIÉTÉS DE CORPS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2017 | AL | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | MT | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | AT | 19.12.2022 | LU | 19.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
AT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
AT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
AT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
AT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 04.05.2022 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 |