EP3497820 - APPARATUS, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR TIMING-BASED RESTRICTION OF A DATA SIGNALING DIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Jack, Anthony c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | 02 /
JANSE VAN RENSBURG, Cornelius, Dawid c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/27] | 01 /
SMITH, Jack, Anthony c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano TX 75024 / US | ||
02 /
JANSE VAN RENSBURG, Cornelius, Dawid c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
Former [2019/25] | 01 /
SMITH, Jack, Anthony c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano TX 75024 / US | ||
02 /
JANSE VAN RENSBURG, Cornelius, Dawid c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano TX 75024 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/25] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17841002.3 | 11.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017CN97133 | Priority number, date | US201615238670 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: US201615238670 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018033029 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3497820 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3497820 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3497820 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/28, H04B7/06, H04W24/02, // H04W72/0446, H04B7/024 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04B7/0486 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | H04W16/28, H04B7/024, H04B7/06, // H04W24/02 | ||
Former IPC [2019/25] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZEITBASIERTEN BESCHRÄNKUNG EINER DATENSIGNALISIERUNGSRICHTUNG | [2019/25] | English: | APPARATUS, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR TIMING-BASED RESTRICTION OF A DATA SIGNALING DIRECTION | [2019/25] | French: | APPAREIL, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE RESTRICTION BASÉE SUR LA DURÉE D'UNE DIRECTION DE SIGNALISATION DE DONNÉES | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6400955 (KAWABATA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2002115474 (YOSHINO HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US7072692 (KATZ MARCOS [FI], et al); | [A]US2010273499 (VAN RENSBURG CORNELIUS [US], et al) | International search | [A]CN103746729 (UNIV HOHAI); | [A]US2014134956 (LEE JUNGWON [US], et al); | [A]CN105850171 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | US6400955 | US2002115474 |