EP3500325 - PORTABLE VAPORIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resolve Digital Health Inc. 17-3000 Langstaff Road Vaughan, ON L4K 4R7 / CA | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADELSON, Rob 17-3000 Langstaff Road Vaughan, Ontario L4K 4R7 / CA | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17841158.3 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017IB54725 | Priority number, date | US201662375591P | 16.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662375591 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018033818 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500325 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/10, A61M11/00 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61M11/042 (EP);
A61M15/008 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (EP,US);
A61M15/0065 (EP);
A61M15/0086 (US);
A61M2205/3358 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/36 (US);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | TRAGBARER VERDAMPFER | [2019/26] | English: | PORTABLE VAPORIZER | [2019/26] | French: | VAPORISATEUR PORTATIF | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 02.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008156326 (BELCASTRO MARC D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure - * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] * [I] 3,8; | [X]US2009156952 (HUNTER C ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2012040512 (YOUNG JOSHUA SMITH [US], et al) [X] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]WO2015106178 (FRIJA KEVIN [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2524856 (TWENTY SIXTEEN 2016 PHARMA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016106936 (KIMMEL JOSH [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * | International search | [A]WO2011146320 (TERRY NATHAN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-11*paragraphs [0003], [0090]*; | [XY]WO2015069914 (NWT HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [X] 1-3, 8 *figure 11, paragraphs [0060], [0061]* [Y] 4-7, 9-11; | [XY]US2015136158 (STEVENS RICK [US], et al) [X] 1-11 *figures 1 and 21, paragraphs [0130], [0160], [0175], [0182]-[0188]* [Y] 4-7, 9-11 |