EP3503246 - ASSEMBLED BATTERY MANUFACTURING METHOD USING USED BATTERIES, AND ASSEMBLED BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO TIRE CORPORATION 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 6640847 / JP | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Takeshi c/o TOYO TIRE&RUBBER CO. LTD. 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0847 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Aya c/o TOYO TIRE&RUBBER CO. LTD. 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0847 / JP | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17841247.4 | 21.03.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017JP11176 | Priority number, date | JP20160161066 | 19.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016161066 | [2019/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034019 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503246 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, G01R31/36 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H01M10/54 (EP,US);
G01R31/36 (US);
G01R31/3644 (US);
G01R31/382 (US);
G01R31/389 (EP);
G01R31/392 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02W30/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN BATTERIE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GEBRAUCHTEN BATTERIEN UND ZUSAMMENGESETZTE BATTERIE | [2019/26] | English: | ASSEMBLED BATTERY MANUFACTURING METHOD USING USED BATTERIES, AND ASSEMBLED BATTERY | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BATTERIE ASSEMBLÉE UTILISANT DES BATTERIES USAGÉES, ET BATTERIE ASSEMBLÉE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2019 | Translation filed | 04.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 25.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005238969 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-9 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008293703 (PANASONIC EV ENERGY CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2010/0047684 A1 *; | [A]WO2011121755 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* , & US 2013/0015702 A1 & EP 2555311 A1 *; | [A]WO2011162014 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2013/0090872 A1 *; | [A]JP2014011060 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-9 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014020818 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2014/0015537 A1 *; | [A]JP2014221002 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2016/0006085 A1 *; | [A]JP2015103387 (PRIMEARTH EV ENERGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2015/0145521 A1 * |