EP3501628 - HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE, DEGASSING AND GAS SUPPLYING DEVICE, INKJET PRINTER, AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING CARBONATED SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Cleansui Corporation 11-2 Oosaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIZAKI Yoshie c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA Yoshiichi c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CLEANSUI CORPORATION 11-2 Oosaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 04 /
ITAKURA Masanori c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CLEANSUI CORPORATION 11-2 Oosaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 05 /
TERAZAWA Kaoru c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CLEANSUI CORPORATION 11-2 Oosaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 06 /
KIKUYA Nobuyuki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 07 /
TANAKA Hiroyuki c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CLEANSUI CORPORATION 11-2 Oosaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 08 /
KUMAMOTO Hideo c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CLEANSUI CORPORATION 11-2 Oosaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 09 /
FUJIKI Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 10 /
ODA Kentarou c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17841408.2 | 07.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017JP28572 | Priority number, date | JP20160159840 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016159840 | [2019/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034183 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501628 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/02, B01D19/00, B01D61/00, B01D69/02, B01D69/08, B01F1/00, B01F3/04, B41J2/19 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B41J2/175 (EP);
B01D19/0042 (US);
B01D19/00 (EP,US);
B01D61/00 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D63/0224 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D69/081 (US);
B01F21/00 (EP,US);
B01F23/20 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | HOHLFASERMEMBRANMODUL, ENTGASUNGS- UND GASZUFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG, TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SPRUDELQUELLE | [2019/26] | English: | HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE, DEGASSING AND GAS SUPPLYING DEVICE, INKJET PRINTER, AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING CARBONATED SPRING | [2019/26] | French: | MODULE DE MEMBRANE À FIBRES CREUSES, DISPOSITIF DE DÉGAZAGE ET D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ, IMPRIMANTE À JET D'ENCRE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE RESSORT CARBONÉ | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | Translation filed | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]JPH0768103 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XI]EP2292318 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]); | [X]US2013280767 (KOBAYASHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [XI]EP3025775 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPS5145936U ; | [XYA]JPH06226057 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]JP2001246232 (JAPAN GORE TEX INC); | [Y]JP2016120489 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) | by applicant | JPH0768103 | JP4593719B | JP2014522307 | JP20160159840 |