EP3500194 - CANNULA WITH PROXIMALLY MOUNTED CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rebound Therapeutics Corporation 13900 Alton Parkway Suite 120 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Peter G. 13900 Alton Parkway Suite 120 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 02 /
TSUKASHIMA, Ross 13900 Alton Parkway Suite 120 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 03 /
VALKO, Jeffrey J. 13900 Alton Parkway Suite 120 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 04 /
HENSON, Michael R. 13900 Alton Parkway Suite 120 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 05 /
MCINTYRE, Todd D. 13900 Alton Parkway Suite 120 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17842143.4 | 17.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US47424 | Priority number, date | US201615239632 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: US201615239632 | US201762483885P | 10.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762483885 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018035366 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500194 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500194 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B1/313, A61B1/04, A61B1/06, A61B17/00 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/3421 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B17/3415 (CN,KR);
A61B1/00009 (CN);
A61B1/00 (CN);
A61B1/00006 (CN);
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/00045 (CN);
A61B1/00087 (CN);
A61B1/00135 (CN);
A61B1/00147 (CN);
A61B1/00188 (CN);
A61B1/00195 (CN);
A61B1/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B1/042 (CN);
A61B1/05 (CN);
A61B1/053 (CN);
A61B1/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0669 (CN);
A61B1/0684 (CN,KR);
A61B1/07 (CN);
A61B1/313 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B1/3132 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/02 (CN);
A61B17/0218 (CN);
A61B17/34 (CN,GB);
A61B17/3423 (CN);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B5/02007 (CN);
A61B5/14532 (CN);
A61B5/1473 (CN);
A61B5/6848 (CN);
A61B5/6868 (CN);
A61B5/6886 (CN);
A61B5/742 (CN);
A61B90/00 (CN);
A61B90/10 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B90/35 (EP,CN,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B90/37 (CN);
A61B17/3417 (CN);
A61B17/3494 (CN,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00035 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00221 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00455 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00743 (CN,KR);
A61B2017/00907 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00991 (CN);
A61B2017/3425 (CN);
A61B2017/3433 (CN);
A61B2017/3454 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00446 (CN);
A61B2034/107 (CN);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/103 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/309 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/3614 (CN);
A61B2090/3618 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/363 (CN,US);
A61B2090/373 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANÜLE MIT PROXIMAL MONTIERTER KAMERA | [2019/26] | English: | CANNULA WITH PROXIMALLY MOUNTED CAMERA | [2019/26] | French: | CANULE AVEC CAMÉRA MONTÉE SUR LE CÔTÉ PROXIMAL | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 07.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24198777.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5836869 (KUDO MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2015141755 (TESAR JOHN [US]) | International search | [Y]US5004332 (EDWARDS D BRANDON [US]); | [A]US2008109026 (KASSAM AMIN [US]); | [A]US2011160535 (BAYER LEX [US], et al); | [Y]US2012224263 (GALLAGHER DENNIS J [US]); | [A]US2014275771 (HENLEY JEREMIAH D [US], et al); | [Y]US2015366583 (DRUMA CALIN [US], et al); | [A]JP2016016053 (KYOCERA OPTEC CO LTD) |