Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018035472 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715680986 | 18.08.2017 | US201662376734 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10605043 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2020 | B2 | US2018051533 | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715680986 | 18.08.2017 | US201662376734 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3035046 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2023 | C | CA3035046 | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715680986 | 18.08.2017 | WO2017US47634 | 18.08.2017 | US201662376734 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017313904B | Global Dossier | 16.09.2021 | B2 | AU2017313904 | 14.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715680986 | 18.08.2017 | WO2017US47634 | 18.08.2017 | US201662376734 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3500719 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | B1 | EP3500719 | 30.10.2019 | A4 | EP3500719 | 26.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US47634 | 18.08.2017 | US201662376734 | 18.08.2016 |