EP3500242 - FIBROUS DOSAGE FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaesi, Aron H. Dieschen seura 1 7078 Lenzerheide / CH | [2019/33] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Blaesi, Aron H. 4 Canal Park Apt. 403 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKA, Nannaji 101 Western Avenue Apt. 51 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
BLAESI, Aron, H. Dieschen seura 1 CH-7078 Lenzerheide / CH | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17842254.9 | 19.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US47702 | Priority number, date | US201662377068P | 19.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662377068 P | WO2016US58935 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: PCT/US2016/058935 | US201762446431P | 14.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762446431 P | US201762468888P | 08.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762468888 P | US201715482776 | 09.04.2017 Original published format: US201715482776 | WO2017US41609 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: PCT/US2017/041609 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018035510 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500242 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/16, A61K31/167, A61K31/192, A61K9/20 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/70 (US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A61K9/00, A61K9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | FASRIGE DARREICHUNGSFORM | [2019/26] | English: | FIBROUS DOSAGE FORM | [2019/26] | French: | FORME POSOLOGIQUE FIBREUSE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 10.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9836738 (THERICS INC [US]); | [A]US2003095998 (POURDEYHIMI BEHNAM [US], et al); | [A]US2014356426 (BARNSCHEID LUTZ [DE], et al); | International search | [A]WO2012112690 (NIMNI MARCEL E [US], et al); | [Y]US2013337022 (PILLAY VINESS [ZA], et al); | [Y]US2016184230 (BLAESI ARON H [US], et al) |